Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Opaliński (z Bnina)

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1396¹Born
21 Jul 143842.6AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
15 Feb 143943.1Ordained BishopBishop of Poznań, Poland
5 Jan 147983.0DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Opaliński (z Bnina):
Bishop Andrzej Opaliński (z Bnina) (died ) Bishop of Poznań

  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,060
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 219
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,744

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013