Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paweł von Legendorf

Deceased

Administrator of Warmia (Ermland), Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Oct 1458AppointedAdministrator of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
21 Sep 1466Ordained BishopAdministrator of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
23 Jul 1467DiedAdministrator of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

MicroData Summary for Paweł von Legendorf
Bishop Paweł von Legendorf (died ) Administrator of Warmia (Ermland)

EventPlace
Ordained Bishopsw. Jana, Church, Torun
Death PlaceBraniewo

  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 262
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,482
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,466, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast