Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignazio de’ Bisogno

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Ascalon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1791BornResina
21 Sep 181624.9Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
28 Sep 184957.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
16 Dec 184958.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
1865¹73.2DiedTitular Bishop of Ascalon

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignazio de’ Bisogno:
Bishop Ignazio de’ Bisogno (born ) Titular Bishop of Ascalon

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 124
  • ob/c2+: CB, 7 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013