Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvador Biempica y Sotomayor

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1727BornCeuta, Spain
29 Mar 179063.1AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
4 Jul 179063.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
27 Aug 179063.6InstalledBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
2 Aug 180275.5DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

MicroData Summary for Salvador Biempica y Sotomayor:
Bishop Salvador Biempica y Sotomayor (born , died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 409
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 107, Number 558

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013