Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de Croy, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

Priest of Order of Saint Benedict


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1505¹Born
29 Mar 152520.2AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
13 Jun 153328.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
13 Jun 153328.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
13 Dec 156459.9DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles de Croy
Bishop Charles de Croy O.S.B. (born 1505, died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSs. Jean et Paul, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 31.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 316
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1533, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast