Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Benini

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1569BornRoma
18 Oct 162253.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
31 Dec 162253.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
2 Nov 163667.3DiedTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Benini:
Archbishop Giovanni Benini (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto

  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 78, Number 464
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 68
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 22 Feb 2015