Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh Belsham, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ely, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Nov 1256AppointedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
14 Oct 1257Ordained BishopBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
15 Jun 1286DiedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Hugh Belsham
Bishop Hugh Belsham O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Ely

  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 61
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 329
  • osb: CB, 20 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018