Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Correale

Deceased

Bishop of Sora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1700BornSorrento
2 Apr 172524.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 174847.6AppointedBishop of Sora, Italy
25 Jul 174847.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sora, Italy
Aug 1764³63.7DiedBishop of Sora, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Correale:
Bishop Antonio Correale (born , died Aug 1764) Bishop of Sora

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 384
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015