Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stefano Autandil

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Tiflis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1736Born
24 May 178548.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tiflis
10 Jul 178548.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tiflis
6 Dec 179458.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Tiflis

MicroData Summary for Stefano Autandil
Archbishop Stefano Autandil (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Tiflis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGori, Italy

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 396
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 27
  • bp/bd/d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795, Page 130, and Page 212
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast