Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Arciniega

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Toledo

Titular Bishop of Adraa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1766BornHerrán
23 Sep 181650.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
23 Sep 181650.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Adraa
27 Oct 181650.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adraa
2 Jan 183568.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Arciniega:
Bishop Juan Arciniega (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Toledo

  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 59
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 135, Number 724

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013