Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Ambrosi

Deceased

Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1844BornCeccano
22 Dec 186622.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 189652.2AppointedBishop of Poggio Mirteto, Italy
5 Jul 189652.3Ordained BishopBishop of Poggio Mirteto, Italy
18 Sep 189955.5AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
17 Aug 192177.4DiedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Ambrosi:
Bishop Domenico Ambrosi (born , died ) Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 362, and Page 542

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013