Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mauro de Larreátegui y Colón, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1650¹BornMadrid, Spain
17 Sep 170353.7AppointedBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
18 Nov 170353.8Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
30 Nov 171161.9DiedBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mauro de Larreátegui y Colón:
Bishop Mauro de Larreátegui y Colón O.S.B. (born 1650, died ) Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala

  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 23, Number 27
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 13 Jun 2015