Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felix (Saeed) Dawood Al Shabi

Bishop of Zakho (Chaldean), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1975 Born
18 Jan 199822.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
29 Jun 199823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
27 Jun 202045.4AppointedBishop of Zakho (Chaldean), Iraq
30 Aug 202045.6Ordained BishopBishop of Zakho (Chaldean), Iraq
6 Sep 202045.6InstalledBishop of Zakho (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Felix (Saeed) Dawood Al Shabi
Bishop Felix (Saeed) Dawood Al Shabi (born ) Bishop of Zakho

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKaremlesh
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Baghdad

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zakho (Chaldean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 27 Aug 2020
  • c3+: CB, 30 Aug 2020
  • i: CB, 6 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 6 Sep 2020

Quantcast