Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pellegrino da Castello, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Zaitun (Zeiton; Zaitoun), China

Note/Previous Titular See: Missionary/China


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jul 1307AppointedBishop
1318¹AppointedBishop of Zaitun (Zeiton; Zaitoun), China
6 Jul 1322DiedBishop of Zaitun (Zeiton; Zaitoun), China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pellegrino da Castello
Bishop Pellegrino da Castello O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Zaitun (Zeiton; Zaitoun)

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,370
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 27 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast