Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Berenguel Landore, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
1312²AppointedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
15 Jul 1317AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
30 Apr 1318Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
20 Oct 1330DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Berenguel Landore
Archbishop Berenguel Landore O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRodez, France
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 200
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 301, Number 138
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,829

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 11 Sep 2020

Quantcast