Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Aguado y Jaraba

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Toledo

Titular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1751BornVillapando
9 Aug 180251.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
9 Aug 180251.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
10 Oct 180251.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
1815¹63.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Aguado y Jaraba:
Bishop Alfonso Aguado y Jaraba (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Toledo

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 95

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013