Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Epaminondas Nunes de Ávila e Silva

Deceased

Bishop of Taubaté, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1869Born
17 Jul 189223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Diamantina, Brazil
29 Apr 190939.8AppointedBishop of Taubaté, Sao Paulo, Brazil
8 Sep 190940.1Ordained BishopBishop of Taubaté, Sao Paulo, Brazil
21 Nov 190940.3InstalledBishop of Taubaté, Sao Paulo, Brazil
29 Jun 193565.9DiedBishop of Taubaté, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Epaminondas Nunes de Ávila e Silva
Bishop Epaminondas Nunes de Ávila e Silva (born , died ) Bishop of Taubaté

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSerro

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1909, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast