Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Nancheng [Nancheng]

Dioecesis Nancemensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Nanchang [Nanchang]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Nancheng, Jiangxi, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Kienchangfu
29 November 1932ErectedVicariate Apostolic of YŁkiang [Yujiang] Prefecture Apostolic of Kienchangfu (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Nancheng [Nancheng]
13 December 1938ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Kienchangfu Vicariate Apostolic of Nancheng [Nancheng]
Diocese of Nancheng [Nancheng]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Nancheng [Nancheng] Diocese of Nancheng [Nancheng]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Nancheng [Nancheng]
19506,885450,0001.5%42630229713ap1951

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.3.1, 22 Nov 2019; Data: 20 Dec 2019

Quantcast