Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico Guillermo Wechsung

Auxiliary Bishop of La Plata, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Pederodiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1975 Born
25 Mar 200630.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina
25 Feb 202347.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Plata, Argentina
25 Feb 202347.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Pederodiana
15 Apr 202347.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pederodiana

MicroData Summary for Federico Guillermo Wechsung
(WikiData: Q116896816)
Bishop Federico Guillermo Wechsung (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of La Plata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonte Grande, Diocese of Lomas de Zamora
Ordained BishopInmaculada Concepción, Cathedral, La Plata, Archdiocese of La Plata

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of La Plata.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2023
  • mn: CB, 25 Feb 2023
  • ob: CB, 3 Mar 2023
  • c2: CB, 6 Apr 2023
  • c3+: CB, 13 Apr 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 24 May 2023