Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Antonio Viana, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Almería, Spain

Note/Previous Titular See: (Juan Antonio de la Virgen María)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1745Born
24 Sep 179246.8AppointedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
4 Aug 179347.6Ordained BishopBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
14 Aug 179852.7AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
28 Jan 180054.1DiedBishop of Almería, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Viana
Bishop Juan Antonio Viana O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Almería

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLagrán
Ordained BishopSanto Domingo, Archdiocese of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
Death PlaceMurcia

  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 78, and Page 437
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 110, Number 575
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1793, Number 10
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast