Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Villaine

Deceased

Bishop of Bayeux, France


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Jan 1345AppointedBishop of Auxerre, France
14 May 1347AppointedBishop of Bayeux, France
3 Sep 1360DiedBishop of Bayeux, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Villaine
Bishop Pierre de Villaine (died ) Bishop of Bayeux

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 125, and Page 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast