Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Verdín y Molina

Deceased

Bishop of Michoacán, México


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Jul 1665AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
27 Jun 1666Ordained BishopBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
27 Nov 1673AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
19 May 1674InstalledBishop of Michoacán, México
29 Apr 1675DiedBishop of Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco Verdín y Molina
Bishop Francisco Verdín y Molina (died ) Bishop of Michoacán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCartagena, Diocese of Cartagena (en España)
Ordained BishopValladolid
Death PlaceValladolid

  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,562
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 202, Number 1,263
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 198
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1666, Number 19
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,191

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast