Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcos Ramírez de Prado y Ovando, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of México, Federal District


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1592Born
9 Oct 163240.4SelectedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
31 Jan 163340.7ConfirmedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
6 Jun 163341.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
14 Dec 163442.6InstalledBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
30 May 163947.0AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
17 Mar 164047.8InstalledBishop of Michoacán, México
15 Dec 166674.6AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
14 May 166775.0DiedArchbishop of México, Federal District

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Marcos Ramírez de Prado y Ovando
Archbishop Marcos Ramírez de Prado y Ovando O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Ordained BishopMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 148, and Page 241
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 236
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 157, Number 996
  • c4: CB, 18 Jan 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1633, Number 23
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 65, Number 5,044

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast