Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maur de Valleville (Malleville)

Deceased

Bishop of Maguelonne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Dec 1453AppointedBishop of Maguelonne, France
11 Jan 1454Ordained BishopBishop of Maguelonne, France
28 Feb 1472DiedBishop of Maguelonne, France

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Maur de Valleville (Malleville)
Bishop Maur de Valleville (Malleville) (died ) Bishop of Maguelonne

  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 183
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,338
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1454, Number 1
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,751

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast