Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fernando Valdés

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1483²Born
24 May 152946.3AppointedBishop of Elne, France
18 Oct 152946.7Ordained BishopBishop of Elne, France
12 Jan 153047.0AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
1 Jul 153249.5AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
30 May 153956.4AppointedBishop of León, Spain
29 Oct 153956.8AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
27 Aug 154663.6AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
9 Dec 156885.9DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Valdés (VIAF: 62878114)
Archbishop Fernando Valdés (born 1483, died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalas, Diocese of Oviedo
Ordained BishopS. Jeronimo, Monastery, Madrid
Death PlaceMadrid

  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 41, Number 203
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 192, and Page 221
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 124, and Page 265
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 296, and Page 211
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,529, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast