Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Xavier Trần Thanh Khân

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Saigon, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Numluli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1902Born
5 Apr 193028.0Ordained PriestPriest of Saigon, Viet Nam
14 Oct 196563.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saigon, Viet Nam
14 Oct 196563.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Numluli
6 Jan 196663.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Numluli
2 Oct 197674.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Saigon, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for François-Xavier Trần Thanh Khân
Bishop François-Xavier Trần Thanh Khân (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Saigon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNung Dinh

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast