Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Plácido Tosantos Medina, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1562²Born
6 Apr 162058.2AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
30 Aug 162058.6Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
12 Feb 162462.1AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
30 Aug 162462.6DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Plácido Tosantos Medina
Bishop Plácido Tosantos Medina O.S.B. (born 1562, died ) Bishop of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBelorado
Ordained BishopSt. Martin, Monastery, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 376, and Page 198
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 138, Number 884
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1620, Number 12
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,449

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast