Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Lorenz von Törring-Stein

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1614Born
30 Jan 163924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
6 Aug 166348.9SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
11 Feb 166449.4ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
13 Apr 166449.6Ordained BishopBishop of Regensburg, Germany
16 Aug 166652.0DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Adam Lorenz von Törring-Stein
Bishop Adam Lorenz von Törring-Stein (born , died ) Bishop of Regensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStein
Ordained BishopRegensburg, Diocese of Regensburg

  • a priest for 27.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 292
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 7
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,813

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Mar 2021

Quantcast