Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Amédée de Talaru

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon, France

Note/Previous Titular See: (Pseudocardinal)


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Dec 1415SelectedArchbishop of Lyon, France
15 Dec 1417ConfirmedArchbishop of Lyon, France
14 Jan 1420Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lyon, France
11 Feb 1444DiedArchbishop of Lyon, France

MicroData Summary for Amédée de Talaru
Archbishop Amédée de Talaru (died ) Archbishop of Lyon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon
Death PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Pierre Chapel, Saint-Jean of Lyon, Cathedral, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon

  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 316
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Nov 1440
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 182
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,741
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 2,929

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast