Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hugues d’Orges

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen, France


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Sep 1416AppointedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
26 Jan 1431AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
19 Aug 1436DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Hugues d’Orges
Archbishop Hugues d’Orges (died ) Archbishop of Rouen

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 153, and Page 426
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 225

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast