Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop György Széchényi

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1592¹Born
15 Mar 163139.2Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
6 May 164755.3AppointedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
9 Jun 165361.4AppointedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
27 Sep 165462.7Ordained BishopBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
7 Dec 166573.9AppointedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
18 Apr 167886.2AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
2 Sep 168694.6AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
18 Feb 1695103.1DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for György Széchényi
Archbishop György Széchényi (born 1592, died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzecheniez
Ordained BishopSumeg

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,354
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 21
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 70, Number 5,573

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast