Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Franjo Soimirovic (Svimirovich), O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Achrida (Ochrida), Bulgaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1614³Born
27 Feb 165136.8AppointedBishop of Prizren, Serbia
21 May 165137.0Ordained BishopBishop of Prizren, Serbia
20 Mar 165641.9AppointedArchbishop of Achrida (Ochrida), Bulgaria
Oct 1673²59.4DiedArchbishop of Achrida (Ochrida), Bulgaria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franjo Soimirovic (Svimirovich)
Archbishop Franjo Soimirovic (Svimirovich) O.F.M. Obs. (born , died Oct 1673) Archbishop of Achrida (Ochrida)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCiprovci
Death PlaceCiprovci

  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 289, and Page 67
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,353
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 38
  • b/d: CB, 12 Mar 2020
  • b/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 243, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast