Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Stefanov (Stephani), O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1645¹Born
10 May 167732.3AppointedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
20 Aug 167934.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
1692¹47.0DiedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anton Stefanov (Stephani)
Bishop Anton Stefanov (Stephani) O.F.M. Obs. (born 1645, died 1692) Bishop of Nicopoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCiprovci
Ordained BishopSainte Marie de l’Assomption, Church, Ciprovci
Death PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,356
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,441
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1679, Number 13
  • ob.loc: CB, 12 Mar 2020
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 243, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast