Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edouard Sinayobye

Bishop of Cyangugu, Rwanda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1966 Born
12 Aug 200034.3Ordained PriestPriest of Butare, Rwanda
6 Feb 202154.7AppointedBishop of Cyangugu, Rwanda
25 Mar 202154.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cyangugu, Rwanda

MicroData Summary for Edouard Sinayobye
Bishop Edouard Sinayobye (born ) Bishop of Cyangugu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceButare, Diocese of Butare
Ordained BishopRusizi Stadium, Cyangugu, Diocese of Cyangugu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cyangugu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Feb 2021
  • ob.loc/bp: CB, 10 Mar 2021
  • c2+: CB, 23 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Mar 2021

Quantcast