Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingo de Silos Santiago Apollinario Moreno, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cádiz, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1770Born
16 Mar 181847.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
16 Mar 181847.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Canatha
19 Jul 181847.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canatha
30 Nov 182454.3SelectedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
21 Mar 182554.6ConfirmedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
9 Mar 185382.6DiedBishop of Cádiz, Spain

MicroData Summary for Domingo de Silos Santiago Apollinario Moreno
Bishop Domingo de Silos Santiago Apollinario Moreno O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Cádiz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaños
Ordained BishopAbbey, Silos

  • a bishop for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 130, and Page 200
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 137, Number 736
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 68
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,293

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast