Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ramón José Arce

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of West Indies, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1755Born
18 Dec 179742.1AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
4 Mar 179842.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
20 Jul 180145.7AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
18 Apr 180650.4SelectedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
26 Aug 180650.8ConfirmedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
7 Jul 181559.7RetiredPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
15 Jul 181660.7RetiredArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
16 Feb 184488.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ramón José Arce
Patriarch Ramón José Arce (born , died ) Patriarch Emeritus of West Indies

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSelaya
Ordained BishopMadrid

  • a bishop for 45.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 134
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 123, and Page 223
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 116, Number 609
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 17
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,557

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast