Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon Judas Thaddäus Schmidt

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany

Titular Bishop of Tricca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1653Born
18 Sep 167723.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Freising, Germany
18 Dec 167724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Freising, Germany
28 Apr 168733.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany
28 Apr 168733.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricca
3 Aug 168733.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricca
7 Feb 169137.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Simon Judas Thaddäus Schmidt
Bishop Simon Judas Thaddäus Schmidt (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Freising

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMünchen
Ordained BishopAugsburg, Diocese of Augsburg

  • a priest for 13.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 388
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1687, Number 9
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,480
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 62, Number 4,765

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast