Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Elie Chedid (Scedid)

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Cyrrhus per i Maroniti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1872Born
9 Apr 189826.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Apr 192654.1SelectedTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus per i Maroniti
21 Jun 192654.2ConfirmedTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus per i Maroniti
20 Sep 192654.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus per i Maroniti
18 Jan 195077.8DiedTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus per i Maroniti

MicroData Summary for Elie Chedid (Scedid)
Archbishop Elie Chedid (Scedid) (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Cyrrhus per i Maroniti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAdeh al-Batrun
Ordained BishopDimare

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1926, Number 60
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 74, Number 5,914, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • c10/c11: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast