Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Amedeo Cardinal di Savoie

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Titular See: (Antipope Felix V)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1383Born
5 Nov 143956.1ElectedPope
24 Jul 144056.8Ordained Bishop
7 Apr 144965.5ResignedPope
23 Apr 144965.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
23 Apr 144965.6Elevated to Cardinal
7 Jan 145167.3DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Amedeo di Savoie
Amedeo Cardinal di Savoie (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastle, Chambéry, France
Ordained BishopBasle
Death PlaceGenève
Buried Place (Original)Monastery, Ripaille
Buried Place (Current)Royal, Santa Sindone, Chapel, Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}, Italy

  • a bishop for 10.4 years
  • a cardinal for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Apr 1449
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 48, Number 3,260

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast