Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Allarmet Cardinal de Brogny (Brognac)

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1342¹Born
11 Aug 138240.6AppointedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
12 Jul 138543.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
12 Jul 138543.5Elevated to Cardinal
13 Jun 140563.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
16 Feb 142684.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Allarmet de Brogny (Brognac) (VIAF: 127443394)
Jean Allarmet Cardinal de Brogny (Brognac) (born 1342, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePetit-Brogny
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Martino Chapel, San Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Notre-Dame, Cathedral, Genève, Diocese of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland

  • a cardinal for 40.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jul 1385
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 533

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Feb 2021

Quantcast