Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Pio Santi

Deceased

Bishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1740³Born
1765¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sovana (Soana), Italy
16 Sep 177635.7AppointedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
21 Sep 177635.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
16 Aug 179958.6DiedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Pio Santi
Bishop Francesco Pio Santi (born , died ) Bishop of Sovana (Soana)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoccalbegna, Diocese of Sovana (Soana)
Ordained BishopSte. Marthe, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 34.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 388
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 348
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 May 2021

Quantcast