Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon Rozgonyi

Deceased

Bishop of Eger, Hungary


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Aug 1428AppointedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
15 Feb 1440AppointedBishop of Eger, Hungary
10 Nov 1444DiedBishop of Eger, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Simon Rozgonyi
Bishop Simon Rozgonyi (died ) Bishop of Eger

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 82
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 524

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 Apr 2021

Quantcast