Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Francisco Romero

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1665²Born
26 Jan 170540.0AppointedBishop of Santiago de Chile
27 Aug 170742.6Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Chile
21 Apr 170843.3InstalledBishop of Santiago de Chile
12 Jul 171752.5AppointedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
19 Oct 171853.7InstalledBishop of Quito, Ecuador
19 Nov 172560.8AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
4 Dec 172762.9InstalledArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
28 Nov 172863.9DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luis Francisco Romero (VIAF: 185145856854722920128)
Archbishop Luis Francisco Romero (born 1665, died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcobendas, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Charcas, Archdiocese of La Plata o Charcas

  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 26, Number 53
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 224, and Page 317
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 326
  • i: CB, 10 Apr 2017
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,625
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 65, Number 5,074

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast