Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Queipo de Llano y Valdés

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1635²Born
23 Sep 168045.7AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
21 Dec 168146.9Ordained BishopBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
19 Apr 169459.2AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
1713¹78.0DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Queipo de Llano y Valdés
Archbishop Juan Queipo de Llano y Valdés (born 1635, died 1713) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOviedo, Diocese of Oviedo, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima, Peru

  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,444
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 302, and Page 317
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 222, Number 1,377
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 40
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 4,966

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast