Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco de Rojas-Borja y Artés

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1604²Born
8 Jan 165349.0AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
9 Feb 165349.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
23 Apr 166359.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ávila, Spain
29 May 167369.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cartagena (en España)
17 Jun 168480.4DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Rojas-Borja y Artés
Archbishop Francisco de Rojas-Borja y Artés (born 1604, died ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 145
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 65, and Page 328
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 182, Number 1,135
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1653, Number 3
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast