Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Rivelli

Deceased

Archbishop of Corf¨, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1795Born
1 Nov 1855³59.9AppointedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
1 Nov 185559.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
18 Sep 185862.8DiedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Rivelli
Archbishop Carlo Rivelli (born , died ) Archbishop of Corf¨

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorf¨
Ordained BishopPropaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 225
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1855, Number 45
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 53, Number 3,751
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,861
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,406

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast