Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Mario Renato Cornejo Radavero

Deceased

Note/Previous Titular See: (left the church)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1927Born
20 Dec 195225.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
20 Feb 196133.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
20 Feb 196133.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sanavus
16 Apr 196133.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sanavus
7 Feb 196941.2ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
7 Feb 196941.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Sanavus
22 Nov 201588.0Died

MicroData Summary for Mario Renato Cornejo Radavero
(Layman) Mario Renato Cornejo Radavero (born , died )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima, Peru
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima, Peru
Death PlaceClinique de l'Europe, Rouen, Archdiocese of Rouen, France

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 54.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 1, Number 30
  • d: CB, 21 Nov 2019
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,113

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast