Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo Pietsch

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Graz-Seckau, Austria

Titular Bishop of Narona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1905Born
27 Oct 192924.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 Aug 194843.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Seckau, Austria
27 Aug 194843.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Narona
7 Nov 194843.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Narona
1969¹63.4ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Graz-Seckau, Austria
30 Sep 198176.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Graz-Seckau, Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leo Pietsch
Bishop Leo Pietsch (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Graz-Seckau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHermagor
Ordained BishopCathedral, Graz, Diocese of Seckau
Death PlaceGraz, Diocese of Graz-Seckau

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1948, Number 122

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Sep 2021

Quantcast