Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Urban IV

Jacques Pantaléon

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1195¹Born
18 Dec 125358.9AppointedBishop of Verdun, France
9 Apr 125560.2AppointedPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
29 Aug 126166.6ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
2 Oct 126469.7DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques Pantaléon (VIAF: 40171486)
Pope Jacques Pantaléon (born 1195, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTroyes, Diocese of Troyes, France

  • a pope for 3.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 530, and Page 275

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Mar 2021

Quantcast