Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume de La Roue, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Oct 1263AppointedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
22 Feb 1264Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
9 Apr 1282DiedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de La Roue
Bishop Guillaume de La Roue O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay

EventPlace
Ordained BishopOrvieto, Diocese of Orvieto, Italy

  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 91
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,332

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Mar 2021

Quantcast